CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS v. PANDYA
Plaintiff: CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS
Defendant: JIGNESH PANDYA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00405
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS.Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MORAN, ALBERT)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Disclosure Statement upon Jignesh Pandya c/o Nital Pandya, Wife by Personal on 01/28/2020 (MORAN, ALBERT)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CHECKERS HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent BURGER BOSSCO INTERMEDIATE, INC., Corporate Parent BURGER BOSSCO HOLDINGS, INC. for CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS. by CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS.(dmc, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD by CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS. (Receipt # PPE210230). (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 EXHIBIT 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, ) Modified on 1/30/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS v. PANDYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHECKERS DRIVE-IN RESTAURANTS
Represented By: ALBERT FRANCIS MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIGNESH PANDYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?