LONGO et al v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: STEPHEN M. LONGO and RICHARD LONGO
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv00958
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Referring Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 Letter dated 3/25/20 by RICHARD LONGO (amas, )
March 18, 2020 Two Alias (2) Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney. Forwarded To: Richard Longo on 3/19/20 (fdc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons by RICHARD LONGO. (fdc, )
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER FOR DIRECT ASSIGNMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES PILOT PROGRAM AND PLAINTIFF HAVING DECLINED CONSENT, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 3/10/2020. 3/11/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SES AND E-MAILED.(amas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY RICHARD LONGO.(amas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by RICHARD LONGO.. (amas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Letter dated 3/2/2020 by RICHARD LONGO (amas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO AWARD IMPROPERLY WITHHELD SSI BENEFIT, FILED BY RICHARD LONGO.(amas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
February 20, 2020 Plain English, Instructions and Motion for Appointment of Counsel mailed to R. Longo. (fdc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO LONGO. (fdc)
February 20, 2020 Three Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: U.S. Attorney's Office, Richard Longo on 2/24/20. (fdc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form)(fdc, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 211778.), filed by RICHARD LONGO.(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONGO et al v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN M. LONGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LONGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?