J.L. et al v. LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: A.L., F.L. and J.L.
Defendant: LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2020cv01416
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. BASCH on behalf of A.L. with Certificate of Service(BASCH, JEFFREY)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH SNYDER BATCHIS on behalf of A.L., F.L., J.L. with Certificate of Service(BATCHIS, LEAH)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MACY T. LASTER on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LASTER, MACY)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONIC PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 5/20/2020 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/23/20. 4/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/13/2020 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/22/20. 4/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY HATHAWAY TAYLOR BROOKS on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service). (FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY ENTERING APPEARANCE MUST FILE ON OWN BEHALF). (BROOKS, AMY) Modified on 4/21/2020 (fb).
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY HATHAWAY TAYLOR BROOKS on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROOKS, AMY)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL D. KRISTOFCO on behalf of LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT, LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT (KRISTOFCO, MICHAEL)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PLACE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FROM THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK IS DIRECTED THAT, UPON RECEIPT OF THE CERTIFIED RECORD FROM THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION, THE CERTIFIED RECORD SHALL BE PLACED UNDER SEAL . SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/15/20. 4/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (mbh, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Seal Administrative Record filed by A.L..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(REIMANN, NICOLE)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J.L.. All Defendants. (REIMANN, NICOLE)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE212919.), filed by J.L., F.L., A.L.., JURY DEMAND. EXHIBIT 1-VIDEOS INCLUDED FLASH DRIVES. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )
March 12, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT. Forwarded To: NICOLE REIMANN on 3/16/20 (jl, )
March 12, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by A.L., F.L., J.L.. (jl, )
March 12, 2020 A.L. EXHIBIT 1-VIDEOS FORWARDED TO CHAMBERS. (jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.L. et al v. LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.
Represented By: NICOLE REIMANN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. BASCH
Represented By: LEAH SNYDER BATCHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.L.
Represented By: NICOLE REIMANN
Represented By: LEAH SNYDER BATCHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.
Represented By: NICOLE REIMANN
Represented By: LEAH SNYDER BATCHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: MACY T. LASTER
Represented By: MICHAEL D. KRISTOFCO
Represented By: AMY HATHAWAY TAYLOR BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?