STURSBERG v. Morrison Sund PLLC et al
Plaintiff: HENRY STURSBERG
Defendant: Morrison Sund PLLC, Matthew Burton and MORRISON SUND, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01635
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay with Proposed Order filed by Matthew Burton, MORRISON SUND, PLLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GALLO, PATRICK)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/9/2020 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT LEAD COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN THE JOINT CONFERENCE CONDUCTED PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(f) & TELEPHONICALLY ATTEND THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/19/20. 5/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALFRED A. GOLLATZ on behalf of Matthew Burton, MORRISON SUND, PLLC with Certificate of Service(GOLLATZ, ALFRED)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Matthew Burton, MORRISON SUND, PLLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A to E, #4 Certificate of Service)(GALLO, PATRICK)
April 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to Matthew Burton, MORRISON SUND, PLLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/13/2020 (bw, )
March 26, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HENRY STURSBERG. (tjd, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14202883.), filed by HENRY STURSBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Jury Demand Form, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(BERNHEIM, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STURSBERG v. Morrison Sund PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Sund PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Burton
Represented By: ALFRED A. GOLLATZ
Represented By: PATRICK J. GALLO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRISON SUND, PLLC
Represented By: ALFRED A. GOLLATZ
Represented By: PATRICK J. GALLO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY STURSBERG
Represented By: DANIEL S. BERNHEIM, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?