GILLIARD
Trustee: ESQ. WILLIAM C. MILLER and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Debtor In Possession: GIOAVONDA LYNETTE GILLIARD
Case Number: 2:2020cv01839
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED, AND THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE CLERK OF THE US BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE E.D.P.A.. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/28/2020. 4/28/2020 ENTERED. COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Appeal)(ahf)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of GIOAVONDA LYNETTE GILLIARD from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ASHELY M. CHAN filed on 3/02/2020. (Attachments: #1 DOCKET)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILLIARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: ESQ. WILLIAM C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: GIOAVONDA LYNETTE GILLIARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?