BEHESHTI v. KIM et al
Plaintiff: PEDRAM BEHESHTI
Defendant: DAVID B WEINER, SIMON X BENITO, LOTA S. ZOTH, JAY P. SHEPARD, J. JOSEPH KIM, WENDY L. YARNO, ANN C. MILLER and ANGEL CABRERA
Nominal Defendant: INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01962
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE AS DETAILED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/5/20. 6/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Stay Further Proceedings filed by SIMON X BENITO, ANGEL CABRERA, INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH..(LOFTUS, PATRICK) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/10/2020 (md, ).
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Denorris Britt re: served Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Amy McLaren by Hand delivery to designated person on 5/8/2020 (NEMEC, BREANDAN)
April 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to SIMON X BENITO, ANGEL CABRERA, J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/21/2020 (bw, ) Modified on 4/21/2020 (bw, ).
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SIMON X BENITO, ANGEL CABRERA, INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14246742.), filed by PEDRAM BEHESHTI. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(NEMEC, BREANDAN) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEHESHTI v. KIM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMON X BENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOTA S. ZOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY P. SHEPARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JOSEPH KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY L. YARNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL CABRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRAM BEHESHTI
Represented By: BREANDAN Q. NEMEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?