HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC v. GADGET SOFTWARE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC
Defendant: DAN CRAIN, RABINDRA SONI, MAXWELL RIGGSBEE, JR. and GADGET SOFTWARE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01966
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC. MAXWELL RIGGSBEE, JR waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RHOADS, STEPHEN)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC. RABINDRA SONI waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RHOADS, STEPHEN)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC. DAN CRAIN waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RHOADS, STEPHEN)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC. GADGET SOFTWARE, INC. waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RHOADS, STEPHEN)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC.(RHOADS, STEPHEN)
April 21, 2020 Summonses Issued as to DAN CRAIN, GADGET SOFTWARE, INC., MAXWELL RIGGSBEE, JR and RABINDRA SONI. Emailed to counsel on 4/21/20 (mbh, )
April 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC. (fb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14246981.), filed by HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(RHOADS, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC v. GADGET SOFTWARE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOBBS & TOWNE CAPITAL III, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN G. RHOADS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN CRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RABINDRA SONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXWELL RIGGSBEE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GADGET SOFTWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?