KULKA v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: LOUISE KULKA
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv02156
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cigna Corporation with Certificate of Service by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(STRAUSS, CAITLIN)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN P. STRAUSS on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(STRAUSS, CAITLIN)
June 12, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE215306 (dmc, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LOUISE KULKA. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (SNYDER, MARC) Modified on 6/3/2020 (fb).
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLYANNE PARRY INVERSO on behalf of LOUISE KULKA (INVERSO, KELLYANNE)
May 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. To: COUNSE-MAILEDEL on 5/6/2020 (bw, )
May 6, 2020 Filing Fee for COMPLAINT or NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOUISE KULKA. (Filing Fee $400, receipt number 0313-14277179). (SNYDER, MARC)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, filed by LOUISE KULKA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KULKA v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISE KULKA
Represented By: MARC H. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?