BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP v. ELDRIDGE
Plaintiff: BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP
Defendant: LINDA J. ELDRIDGE
Case Number: 2:2020cv02168
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP. LINDA J. ELDRIDGE waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (ANDREWS WILSON, KRISTEN)
May 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to LINDA J. ELDRIDGE. E-mailed To: KRISTEN ANDREWS WILSON, ESQ. on 5/8/2020 (dmc, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Broomall Operating Company LP against LINDA J. ELDRIDGE, filed by BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(ANDREWS WILSON, KRISTEN)
May 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to LINDA J. ELDRIDGE. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/6/2020 (bw, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Linda J. Eldridge against BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14275206.), filed by BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ANDREWS WILSON, KRISTEN) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/7/2020) (nd, ) (with chambers with permission). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #4 Sealed Exhibit Page ) (nd, ). Modified on 5/7/2020 (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP v. ELDRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOMALL OPERATING COMPANY LP
Represented By: KRISTEN ANDREWS WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA J. ELDRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?