HARRELL v. CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: TERESA HARRELL
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. and CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02359
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Copy of order and docket e-mailed to US Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Florida on 6/24/20. (lisad, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. NO. #5 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE CLERK OF THE US BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/22/20. 6/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/22/20. 6/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SEIDEN, STUART)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition re #5 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by TERESA HARRELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MAYS, SEAN) Modified on 6/12/2020 (lisad, ).
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. OF CONSENT TO THE ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OR JUDGMENT (SEIDEN, STUART)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TERESA HARRELL.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O)(MAYS, SEAN)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK N.A..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Notice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEIDEN, STUART)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER #2 MOTION TO TRANSFER IS DENIED AS MOOT AND #3 AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/27/2020.5/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK N.A..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SEIDEN, STUART)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK N.A... (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SEIDEN, STUART)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A., CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14302464), filed by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A., CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEIDEN, STUART)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRELL v. CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Represented By: STUART I. SEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: STUART I. SEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA HARRELL
Represented By: SEAN P. MAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?