GARCIA II v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: HAMLET GARCIA II
Defendant: JAMES-C DUFF, GERALD-AUSTIN [MCHUGH], DONALD-JOHN TRUMP, DANIELLE OUTLAW, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOSEPH H. EVERS and THOMAS-WESTERMAN WOLF
Case Number: 2:2020cv02657
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES IS DENIED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. & 1915 (e); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/23/20. 7/23/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/23/20. 7/23/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 15, 2020 REGENERATE #4 TO THE PRO SE (JL )
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by HAMLET GARCIA II (JL )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RETURN THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SO MR. GARCIA AD RETAIN A COPY IN CIVIL ACTION FILE. IF GARCIA SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL SIGN THE MOTION AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER WITH THE INFORMATION AS DIRECTED BELOW. ALTERNATIVELY, GARCIA MAY SUBMIT $400 TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND TO MR. GARCIA AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE, VIA THE EMAIL ADDRESS THAT MR. GARCIA HAS SUPPLIED TO THE COURT. IF MR. GARCIA SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, SIGN AND COMPLETE THE FORM IN A MANNER THAT MAKES CLEAR TO THE COURT HOW HE IS SUPPORTING HIMSELF AND THAT CLARIFIES THE ISSUES NOTED ABOVE, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 6/19/20. 6/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE. * APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER EMAILED TO GARCIA ON 6/22/20*(rf, ) Modified on 6/22/2020 (afm, ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2020) (bw, ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JAMES-C DUFF, JOSEPH H. EVERS, DANIELLE OUTLAW, DONALD-JOHN TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THOMAS-WESTERMAN WOLF, GERALD-AUSTIN [MCHUGH], filed by HAMLET GARCIA II. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(bw, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by HAMLET GARCIA II..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA II v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES-C DUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD-AUSTIN [MCHUGH]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD-JOHN TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE OUTLAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH H. EVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS-WESTERMAN WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAMLET GARCIA II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?