1912 Chestnut Partners, LP v. THE GAP INC.
Plaintiff: 1912 Chestnut Partners, LP
Defendant: THE GAP INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02667
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/30/20. 7/30/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Pretrial Conference held on 7/30/20. (JL )
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 4, 2020 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE IS CANCELLED.(dc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims , COUNTERCLAIM against 1912 Chestnut Partners, LP by THE GAP INC..(TUCKER, JOE)
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUGUST 4, 2020 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/25/2020 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 11/12/2020. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/12/2020. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/12/2020. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR ABOUT SEPTEMBER 7, 2020. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 12/1/2020 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/22/2020. 6/22/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 CORRESPONDENCE FROM DAVID S. JAFFE, ESQ., DATED 6/19/2020.(rt)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 CORRESPONDENCE FROM JOE H. TUCKER, JR., ESQ., DATED 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(rt)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Defendant The Gap, Inc.s response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed by July 17, 2020. by THE GAP INC.. (DIAMOND, SCOTT)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE GAP INC.. THE GAP INC. waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (DIAMOND, SCOTT)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Edatil P. Carmona re: served Summons, Complaint, Case Management Track Designation Form Civil Cover Sheet upon Terence Doe by Substituted on June 16, 2020 (JAFFE, DAVID)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by THE GAP INC. Designation Form (TUCKER, JOE)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOE H. TUCKER, JR on behalf of THE GAP INC. with Certificate of Service(TUCKER, JOE)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND on behalf of THE GAP INC. with Certificate of Service(DIAMOND, SCOTT)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN D. ROSENAU on behalf of 1912 Chestnut Partners, LP (ROSENAU, JONATHAN)
June 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to THE GAP INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/8/20 (JL )
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14338536.), filed by 1912 Chestnut Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(JAFFE, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1912 Chestnut Partners, LP v. THE GAP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1912 Chestnut Partners, LP
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL JAFFE
Represented By: JONATHAN D. ROSENAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GAP INC.
Represented By: SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND
Represented By: JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?