1911 Chestnut Partners LP v. Banana Republic LLC
Plaintiff: 1911 Chestnut Partners LP
Defendant: Banana Republic LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02680
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. A Preliminary Pretrial Telephone Conference was held on 8/3/20. (fdc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiffs ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Banana Republic by 1911 Chestnut Partners LP.(JAFFE, DAVID)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing:A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/3/20 AT 2:00 PM (BY TELEPHONE) BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel, #2 Schedule Information Report)(fdc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with TO THE COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH COUNTERCLAIMS , COUNTERCLAIM against 1911 Chestnut Partners LP by Banana Republic LLC.(TUCKER, JOE)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BANANA REPUBLIC, LLCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY JULY 17, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/2/20. 7/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Defendant Banana Republic, LLCs response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed by July 17, 2020 by Banana Republic LLC. (DIAMOND, SCOTT) Modified on 7/1/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Banana Republic LLC. Banana Republic LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (DIAMOND, SCOTT)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Edatil P. Carmona re: served Summons, Complaint, Case Management Track Designation Form Civil Cover Sheet upon Terence Doe by Substituted on June 16, 2020 (JAFFE, DAVID)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Banana Republic LLC Designation Form (TUCKER, JOE)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOE H. TUCKER, JR on behalf of Banana Republic LLC with Certificate of Service(TUCKER, JOE)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND on behalf of Banana Republic LLC with Certificate of Service(DIAMOND, SCOTT)
June 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to Banana Republic LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/9/20 (JL )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN D. ROSENAU on behalf of 1911 Chestnut Partners LP (ROSENAU, JONATHAN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14339014.), filed by 1911 Chestnut Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(JAFFE, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1911 Chestnut Partners LP v. Banana Republic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1911 Chestnut Partners LP
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL JAFFE
Represented By: JONATHAN D. ROSENAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Republic LLC
Represented By: SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND
Represented By: JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?