BIDDLE v. UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: DONNA BIDDLE
Defendant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv02728
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Unum Group, d/b/a Unum Group Corporation in the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania with Certificate of Service by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(HENEFER, E.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (HENEFER, E.)
June 11, 2020 Summons Issued as to UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 6/11/2020 (sg, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14343253.), filed by DONNA BIDDLE. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form)(PARKER, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIDDLE v. UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA BIDDLE
Represented By: MICHAEL J. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?