SPIVEY et al v. SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.
Plaintiff: WESLEY MONTGOMERY, WILLIAM HOWELLS, LOUISE HOWELLS, CHRISTINE KELLY, TROY ORR, KIMBERLY JOHNSTON, HUGH KELLY and CARL SPIVEY
Defendant: SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02814
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LOUISE HOWELLS, WILLIAM HOWELLS, KIMBERLY JOHNSTON, CHRISTINE KELLY, HUGH KELLY, WESLEY MONTGOMERY, TROY ORR, CARL SPIVEY As To ALL PLAINTIFFS(SHENKAN, RICHARD)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To ALL PLAINTIFFS(SHENKAN, RICHARD)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. SHOULD ANSWER THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 6/30/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/19/20. 6/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY TO HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/19/20. 6/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Santander Consumer USA Holdings Inc., Santander Holdings USA Inc., Banco Santander, S.A. with Certificate of Service by SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC..(DEVYVER, KRISTOPHER)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14350987), filed by SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(DEVYVER, KRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPIVEY et al v. SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY MONTGOMERY
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HOWELLS
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISE HOWELLS
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE KELLY
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY ORR
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY JOHNSTON
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGH KELLY
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL SPIVEY
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHENKAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.
Represented By: KRISTOPHER ISSAC DEVYVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?