ISMAN v. BENITO, et al
Plaintiff: ARTHUR ISMAN
Defendant: SIMON X BENITO, DAVID B WEINER, JAY P. SHEPARD, LOTA S. ZOTH, J. JOSEPH KIM, WENDY L. YARNO and ANN C. MILLER
Nominal Defendant: INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02817
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING ACTIONS ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES, INCLUDING PRE-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND ANY TRIAL UNDER CV 20-1962 PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 42 (a). EVERY PLEADING FILED IN THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION, OR IN ANY SEPARATE ACTION INCLUDED HEREIN, MUST BEAR THE FOLLOWING CAPTION: IN RE INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION LEAD CASE CV 20-1962. ALL PAPERS FILED IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION WILL BE MAINTAINED IN LEAD CASE 20-CV-1962; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/21/20. 7/21/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF THOMAS J. MCKENNA TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT UNDER LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2 (b) IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/20/20.7/20/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice OF THOMAS J. McKENNA ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14430171.) filed by ARTHUR ISMAN.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(DONOVAN, MICHAEL)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 STIPULATION Consolidating Related Actions, Accepting Service and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel by ARTHUR ISMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (DONOVAN, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/15/2020 (fb).
June 15, 2020 Summons Issued as to SIMON X BENITO, INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/15/2020 (bw, )
June 12, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARTHUR ISMAN. (fb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SIMON X BENITO, INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14351241.), filed by ARTHUR ISMAN. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff)(DONOVAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISMAN v. BENITO, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMON X BENITO
Represented By: PATRICK J. LOFTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B WEINER
Represented By: PATRICK J. LOFTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY P. SHEPARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOTA S. ZOTH
Represented By: PATRICK J. LOFTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JOSEPH KIM
Represented By: PATRICK J. LOFTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY L. YARNO
Represented By: PATRICK J. LOFTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN C. MILLER
Represented By: PATRICK J. LOFTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR ISMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D. DONOVAN
Represented By: THOMAS J. MCKENNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?