BRYN MAWR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC. v. Hipskind Solutions Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: BRYN MAWR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC.
Defendant: Whoa Networks Inc. and Hipskind Solutions Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02934
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER TO MS. FARLEY; FROM ULRIKE HEVENER (DEPUTY TO JUDGE KEARNEY); DATED 8/21/20; RE: SERVICE. (amas, )
June 22, 2020 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Hipskind Solutions Group, Inc., Whoa Networks Inc.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/22/20 (JL )
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BRYN MAWR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(FARLEY, BARBARA)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER PLAINTIFF SHALL, NO LATER THAN 6/24/2020, EITHER: (1) FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PROPERLY PLEADING THE PARTIES' CITIZENSHIP OR (2) SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT DISMISS THIS CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/19/2020. 6/19/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL.(ka, )
June 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Hipskind Solutions Group, Inc., Whoa Networks Inc.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/19/2020 (bw, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14363488.), filed by BRYN MAWR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(FARLEY, BARBARA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2020: #5 Corrected Designation Form) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYN MAWR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC. v. Hipskind Solutions Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whoa Networks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipskind Solutions Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYN MAWR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC.
Represented By: BARBARA LANZA FARLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?