Leone v. OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Leone, ANDREA CAJUSTE, GARY PRICE, WARREN TESTA, DANIELLE A. LOGELFO, JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT, DEBRA J. MURRAY, PETER MCGAHAN, GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III, NADINE CLARK, ROBERT BRISTEL, ROBERT D, MORSE, SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA, KIMBERLY MESZAROS, TIMOTHY MATTHEWS, RANDALL ORNER, MICHAEL NUETZMANN, DEBRA LADENHEIM, KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY, ELISE L. ARNONE, HIROSHI SEKIYA, PAUL FRANCESCHINI, FELICIA SCAROLA, JEFFREY INTERMESOLI, NORMAN RICH, ERIC GODDUHN, SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI, BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT, CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES, MARCO MARINO, JAY S. MOSES, ROBERT E. REED, MARIA CALVIN, JANINE M. COLON, CHRISTINE DUBORG, JENNIFER L. AEBI, SCOTT SHELLENBARGER, LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE and CHARLES ZERBO
Defendant: BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS and JOHN DOES
Case Number: 2:2020cv03158
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLEAD MORE SPECIFIC ALLEGATIONS OF THE RELIANCE LOSSES SUFFERED BY THESE PLAINTIFFS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/15/22. 9/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/15/22. 9/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Response re #25 Notice (Other) Defendants' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by ELISE L. ARNONE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GRABAR, JOSHUA)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Pension Plan)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FIVE ADDITIONAL PAGES FOR MOTION TO DISMISS RESPONSE AND REPLY WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION CORRECTED Stipulation for Five Additional Pages for Motion to Dismiss Response and Reply by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION Stipulation for Five Additional Pages for Motion to Dismiss Response and Reply by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS. (REISS, STEPHANIE)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JENNIFER L. AEBI, LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE, ELISE L. ARNONE, CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES, ROBERT BRISTEL, ANDREA CAJUSTE, MARIA CALVIN, JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT, NADINE CLARK, JANINE M. COLON, CHRISTINE DUBORG, PAUL FRANCESCHINI, ERIC GODDUHN, JEFFREY INTERMESOLI, DEBRA LADENHEIM, DANIELLE A. LOGELFO, Kristin Leone, KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY, MARCO MARINO, GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III, TIMOTHY MATTHEWS, PETER MCGAHAN, KIMBERLY MESZAROS, ROBERT D, MORSE, JAY S. MOSES, DEBRA J. MURRAY, SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA, MICHAEL NUETZMANN, RANDALL ORNER, SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI, GARY PRICE, ROBERT E. REED, NORMAN RICH, BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT, FELICIA SCAROLA, HIROSHI SEKIYA, SCOTT SHELLENBARGER, WARREN TESTA, CHARLES ZERBO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Nestico in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Annual Funding Notice)(LECHTZIN, ERIC)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 11/18/20, TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 12/18/20 TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/16/20. 11/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 11/13/20, TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 12/14/20 TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/7/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Olympus Corporation with Certificate of Service by OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS.(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS.Memorandum of Law; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Pension Plan, #3 Exhibit B-Lump Sum Letter, #4 Exhibit C-Summary Chart, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE PLEADING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/9/20. 9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER RE: Leave to File Reply In Support of Request for a Pre-Motion Conference on Its Anticipated Motion to Dismiss filed by OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS..(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) Modified on 9/8/2020 (nd, ).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION Pre-Motion Conference re Olympus' anticipated Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Letter Request) filed by JENNIFER L. AEBI, LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE, ELISE L. ARNONE, CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES, ROBERT BRISTEL, ANDREA CAJUSTE, MARIA CALVIN, JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT, NADINE CLARK, JANINE M. COLON, CHRISTINE DUBORG, PAUL FRANCESCHINI, ERIC GODDUHN, JEFFREY INTERMESOLI, DEBRA LADENHEIM, DANIELLE A. LOGELFO, Kristin Leone, KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY, MARCO MARINO, GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III, TIMOTHY MATTHEWS, PETER MCGAHAN, KIMBERLY MESZAROS, ROBERT D, MORSE, JAY S. MOSES, DEBRA J. MURRAY, SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA, MICHAEL NUETZMANN, RANDALL ORNER, SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI, GARY PRICE, ROBERT E. REED, NORMAN RICH, BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT, FELICIA SCAROLA, HIROSHI SEKIYA, SCOTT SHELLENBARGER, WARREN TESTA, CHARLES ZERBO. (LECHTZIN, ERIC)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER RE: Pre-Motion Conference re Olympus' anticipated Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Letter Request) filed by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS..(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) Modified on 9/8/2020 (nd, ).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF STEPHANIE R. REISS, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/20/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie R. Reiss by BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, JOHN DOES, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14509521.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD on behalf of BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, JOHN DOES, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS with Certificate of Service(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARISSA KATRYNA ZALASKY on behalf of BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, JOHN DOES, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS with Certificate of Service(ZALASKY, MARISSA)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE R. REISS on behalf of BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, JOHN DOES, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS with Certificate of Service(REISS, STEPHANIE)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI, NADINE CLARK, WARREN TESTA, KIMBERLY MESZAROS, NORMAN RICH, LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE, JAY S. MOSES, JENNIFER L. AEBI, JEFFREY INTERMESOLI, HIROSHI SEKIYA, ELISE L. ARNONE, CHARLES ZERBO, DEBRA J. MURRAY, ROBERT D, MORSE, BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT, TIMOTHY MATTHEWS, PAUL FRANCESCHINI, FELICIA SCAROLA, GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III, CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES, KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY, MARCO MARINO, PETER MCGAHAN, ROBERT BRISTEL, RANDALL ORNER, SCOTT SHELLENBARGER, SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA, MARIA CALVIN, Kristin Leone, ERIC GODDUHN, CHRISTINE DUBORG, JANINE M. COLON, DANIELLE A. LOGELFO, DEBRA LADENHEIM, ANDREA CAJUSTE, GARY PRICE, ROBERT E. REED, JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT, MICHAEL NUETZMANN. BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS waiver sent on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (LECHTZIN, ERIC)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI, NADINE CLARK, WARREN TESTA, KIMBERLY MESZAROS, NORMAN RICH, LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE, JAY S. MOSES, JENNIFER L. AEBI, JEFFREY INTERMESOLI, HIROSHI SEKIYA, ELISE L. ARNONE, CHARLES ZERBO, DEBRA J. MURRAY, ROBERT D, MORSE, BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT, TIMOTHY MATTHEWS, PAUL FRANCESCHINI, FELICIA SCAROLA, GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III, CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES, KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY, MARCO MARINO, PETER MCGAHAN, ROBERT BRISTEL, RANDALL ORNER, SCOTT SHELLENBARGER, SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA, MARIA CALVIN, Kristin Leone, ERIC GODDUHN, CHRISTINE DUBORG, JANINE M. COLON, DANIELLE A. LOGELFO, DEBRA LADENHEIM, ANDREA CAJUSTE, GARY PRICE, ROBERT E. REED, JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT, MICHAEL NUETZMANN. OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS waiver sent on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (LECHTZIN, ERIC)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC LECHTZIN on behalf of JENNIFER L. AEBI, LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE, ELISE L. ARNONE, CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES, ROBERT BRISTEL, ANDREA CAJUSTE, MARIA CALVIN, JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT, NADINE CLARK, JANINE M. COLON, CHRISTINE DUBORG, PAUL FRANCESCHINI, ERIC GODDUHN, JEFFREY INTERMESOLI, DEBRA LADENHEIM, DANIELLE A. LOGELFO, Kristin Leone, KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY, MARCO MARINO, GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III, TIMOTHY MATTHEWS, PETER MCGAHAN, KIMBERLY MESZAROS, ROBERT D, MORSE, JAY S. MOSES, DEBRA J. MURRAY, SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA, MICHAEL NUETZMANN, RANDALL ORNER, SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI, GARY PRICE, ROBERT E. REED, NORMAN RICH, BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT, FELICIA SCAROLA, HIROSHI SEKIYA, SCOTT SHELLENBARGER, WARREN TESTA, CHARLES ZERBO (LECHTZIN, ERIC)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC H. EDELSON on behalf of Kristin Leone with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EDELSON, MARC)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS, OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS. E-mailed To: JOSHUA H. GRABAR, ESQ. on 6/30/2020 (dmc, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14383756.), filed by Kristin Leone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/30/2020) (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leone v. OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENEFITS ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF OLYMPUS
Represented By: JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD
Represented By: MARISSA KATRYNA ZALASKY
Represented By: STEPHANIE R. REISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLYMPUS CORPORATION OF THE AMERICAS
Represented By: JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD
Represented By: MARISSA KATRYNA ZALASKY
Represented By: STEPHANIE R. REISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Represented By: JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD
Represented By: MARISSA KATRYNA ZALASKY
Represented By: STEPHANIE R. REISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Leone
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: MARC H. EDELSON
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA CAJUSTE
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY PRICE
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN TESTA
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE A. LOGELFO
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SAMUEL CHILCUTT
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA J. MURRAY
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER MCGAHAN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUSTAV MARTINEZ, III
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADINE CLARK
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BRISTEL
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT D, MORSE
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY NOBLE-CHYLA
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY MESZAROS
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MATTHEWS
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL ORNER
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL NUETZMANN
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA LADENHEIM
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK WILLIAM MACKEY
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISE L. ARNONE
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIROSHI SEKIYA
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL FRANCESCHINI
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA SCAROLA
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY INTERMESOLI
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN RICH
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC GODDUHN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN A. PLATE-GRANIERI
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA T. ROCKHOLT
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER S. BARNES
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCO MARINO
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY S. MOSES
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. REED
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CALVIN
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANINE M. COLON
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE DUBORG
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER L. AEBI
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT SHELLENBARGER
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA ALKINS-LALLAVE
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES ZERBO
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: ERIC LECHTZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?