MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC v. GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.
Plaintiff: MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC
Defendant: GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03271
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. Rule 12(b) Letter to the Court (LAHAD, JOHN)
August 26, 2020 PLEADINGS #84, 86 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 22) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER THE PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER REGARDING THE ISSUES RAISED IN DEFENDANTS MOTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/19/20. 8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Telephone Conference held on 8/19/20 (rf, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LORA JASMINA KRSULICH IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/18/20. 8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Lora Jasmina Krsulich ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14500524.) filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sponsor's Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, JOSEPH)
August 14, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(MCGRAVEY, DANIEL)
August 12, 2020 DOC. NOS. 52, 59, 60, 61, 62, 63, 69, 70, 71, 72, 74, 77 MAILED TO COUNSEL (ems)
August 12, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. MCGRAVEY on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC with Certificate of Service(MCGRAVEY, DANIEL)
July 31, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Memorandum; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(LAHAD, JOHN)
July 31, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. GORDON on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, JOSEPH)
July 31, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by GAETAN ALFANO on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ALFANO, GAETAN)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED BY THE HONORABLE ALAN D. ALBRIGHT (DOC. 46) IS VACATED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/27/20. 7/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON THE RECORD SET FOR 8/19/2020 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. (sl, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (MABEY, WARREN)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JASON M. ZUCCHI FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/21/20. 7/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED. *ECF REGISTRATION PAPERWORK NOT MAILED TO ZUCCHI*(rf, )
July 21, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14435744). (MABEY, WARREN)
July 21, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jason M. Zucchi filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC.Certificate of Service.(MABEY, WARREN)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF INDRANIL MUKERJI IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/20/20. 7/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED. *ECF REGISTRATION PAPERWORK NOT MAILED TO MUKERJI*(rf, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH V. COLAIANNI, JR. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/20/20. 7/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED. *ECF REGISTRATION PAPERWORK NOT MAILED TO COLAIANNI*(rf, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RUFFIN B. CORDELL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/20/20. 7/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED. *ECF REGISTRATION PAPERWORK NOT MAILED TO CORDELL*(rf, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BRIAN J. LIVEDALEN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/20/20. 7/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED. *ECF REGISTRATION PAPERWORK NOT MAILED TO LIVEDALEN*(rf, )
July 16, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14426445). (MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14426430). (MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14426417). (MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14426399). (MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Indranil Mukerji filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC.Certificate of Service.(MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Joseph V. Colaianni, Jr. filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC.Certificate of Service.(MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Ruffin B. Cordell filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC.Certificate of Service.(MABEY, WARREN)
July 16, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Livedalen filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC.Certificate of Service.(MABEY, WARREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by WARREN MABEY, JR on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC with Certificate of Service(MABEY, WARREN)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RICHARD L. JOLLY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/14/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JACOB W. BUCHDAHL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/14/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARK HATCH-MILLER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/14/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOHN P. LAHAD IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/14/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ARUN SUBRAMANIAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/14/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Jolly, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14418594.) filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
July 10, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jacob W. Buchdahl, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14414281.) filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
July 10, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Mark Hatch-Miller, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14414253.) filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
July 10, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice John P. Lahad ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14414240.) filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
July 10, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Arun Subramanian, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14414218.) filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
July 9, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. CIANCIULLI on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT REPORT SETTING FORTH THE STATUS OF THIS CASE, INCLUDING WHAT DISCOVERY HAS BEEN AND REMAINS TO BE COMPLETED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/8/20. 7/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 51 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-00672. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 2, 2020 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GLOBUS MEDICALSMOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). It is therefore ORDERED that Globus Medicals motion for transfer venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 49 BRIEF by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 48 BRIEF by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indranil Mukerji on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC (Mukerji, Indranil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 8/3/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 9/25/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2020. Motions due by 4/9/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2021 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #42 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. In light of ECF No. 45, the Court MOOTS this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for telephonic motion hearing. Issue is regarding final schedule in the case. The defendant wishes to move some dates forward the plaintiff is opposed. The day before the Markman Hearing in August the parties will receive the Court's preliminary construction. The Court suggests that the parties wait until after the Markman Hearing and then this issue can be settled. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION FOR REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER re #39 Order, by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. Based on the foregoing, it is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs proposed scheduling order be entered in this case with the following amendment: Defendants deadline to serve its PIC is delayed until May 8, 2020. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint proposed scheduling order consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Partial Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. re #22 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case (Hatch-Miller, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 37 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 36 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 3-2-2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/14/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2020, (kd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 8/3/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, on the Sixth Floor, United States Courthouse, 501 West Fifth Street, Austin, TX, before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for telephonic scheduling conference and telephonic discovery hearing. Parties have agreed to have 8/3 full day blocked out as Markman Hearing however will need to check with their clients the Court asks parties to confirm by the end of the week if 8/3 is okay and if not, the parties should confer and suggest 2 or 3 agreed dates for the Markman Hearing. There is an issue whether the Court has jurisdiction over this case so the Court stated that the Markman Hearing will not go forward until the jurisdiction issue is settled. The Court asks that the parties keep the Court (Law Clerk) in the loop so that the schedule can be adjusted if needed. If Court is not in the loop there is nothing that they can do about dates that have already passed. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 3/5/2020 02:15 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Richard L. Jolly ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13247026) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC., re #22 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hatch-Miller, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the parties' joint motion to modify the briefing schedule and form for Defendant's pending Motion to Transfer Venue. The Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties shall proceed according to the following schedule:(1) Feb. 21, 2020 - Globus deadline to file its reply, with a page limit of eight pages. The reply may address the Google decision or any content in Moskowitz's opposition.(2) Feb. 28, 2020 - Moskowitz deadline to file a five-page sur-reply addressing any Google argument made by Globus in its reply.(3) March 6, 2020 - Globus deadline to file a five-page sur-sur-reply addressing Moskowitz's Google case arguments only.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Modified Briefing Form and Schedule re #22 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including February 21, 2020 to respond/reply.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time)(Hatch-Miller, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC, re #22 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2020 02:15 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 7, 2020 to respond/reply. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Readiness for Initial Case Management Conference by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC (Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Change Venue , MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Declaration of Robert Miller, #3 Declaration of Aditya Muzumdar, #4 Exhibit 1 - To Declaration of Aditya Muzumdar, #5 Proposed Order)(Hatch-Miller, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. answer due 1/27/2020. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendant has until on or before January 27, 2020 to answer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Jacob W. Buchdahl ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12946299) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Mark Howard Hatch-Miller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12946238) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Arun Subramanian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12946158) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P. Lahad on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. Attorney John P. Lahad added to party GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.(pty:dft) (Lahad, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Jason M. Zucchi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12899133) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Jack R. Wilson, IV ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12899049) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Laura C. Whitworth ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898993) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Indranil Mukerji ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898928) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Brian J. Livedalen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898859) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Joseph V. Colaianni, Jr, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898771) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Michael J. Ballanco ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898641) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Ruffin B. Cordell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898143) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12872679), filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC v. GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD L. JOLLY
Represented By: MARK H HATCH-MILLER
Represented By: JOHN P LAHAD
Represented By: ARUN SUBRAMANIAN
Represented By: JACOB W. BUCHDAHL
Represented By: LORA JASMINA KRSULICH
Represented By: JEFFREY S. CIANCIULLI
Represented By: JOSEPH L. GORDON
Represented By: GAETAN ALFANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC
Represented By: INDRANIL MUKERJI
Represented By: Michael J. Ballanco
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: Ruffin B. Cordell
Represented By: Joseph V. Colaianni, Jr.
Represented By: Jason M. Zucchi
Represented By: Laura C. Whitworth
Represented By: Brian J. Livedalen
Represented By: Jack R. Wilson, IV
Represented By: WARREN MABEY, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL J. MCGRAVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?