FETTIG v. KIM et al
Plaintiff: BRANDON FETTIG
Defendant: DAVID B WEINER, SIMON X BENITO, LOTA S. ZOTH, JAY P. SHEPARD, J. JOSEPH KIM, WENDY L. YARNO, ANN C. MILLER and ANGEL CABRERA
Nominal Defendant: INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03316
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING ACTION IS HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES, INCLUDING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND ANY TRIAL, UNDER CASE NO. 20-1962. ALL PAPERS FILED IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION WILL BE MAINTAINED IN ONE FILED UNDER LEAD CASE NO. 20-1962.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/27/20. 8/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Lota S. Zoth by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Wendy L. Yarno by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon David B. Weiner by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Jay P. Shepard by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Ann C. Miller by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon J. Joseph Kim by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Angel Cabrera by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Simon X. Benito by Certified Mail on July 30, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Greg Dobson re: served Summons upon Inovio Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Certified Mail on July 14, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COPPOLA, VINCENT) Modified on 7/29/2020 (fb).
July 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to SIMON X BENITO, ANGEL CABRERA, J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/9/2020 (bw, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SIMON X BENITO, ANGEL CABRERA, INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., J. JOSEPH KIM, ANN C. MILLER, JAY P. SHEPARD, DAVID B WEINER, WENDY L. YARNO, LOTA S. ZOTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14403986.), filed by BRANDON FETTIG.(COPPOLA, VINCENT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FETTIG v. KIM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMON X BENITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOTA S. ZOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY P. SHEPARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JOSEPH KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY L. YARNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL CABRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: INOVIO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON FETTIG
Represented By: VINCENT A COPPOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?