RITE AID CORPORATION et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Plaintiff: RITE AID CORPORATION and RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PLIVA, INC., AKORN, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SANDOZ, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., MALLINCKRODT INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, Mylan N.V., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., ALVOGEN INC., MYLAN INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., GREENSTONE LLC, TELIGENT, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. and SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03367
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. (KASOWITZ, MARC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG M. REISER on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(REISER, CRAIG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M. MATHIAS on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(MATHIAS, EDWARD)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL ADCOX on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(ADCOX, RACHEL)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alvogen Pharma US, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ALVOGEN INC..(KEELEY, MICHAEL)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. KEELEY on behalf of ALVOGEN INC. with Certificate of Service(KEELEY, MICHAEL)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' 7/9/2020 COMPLAINT IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/28/2020. 7/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO. 1467 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
July 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, GREENSTONE LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Mylan N.V., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. E-mailed To: ERIC L. BLOOM, ESQ. on 7/10/2020 (dmc, )
July 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.. (fb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP..(BLOOM, ERIC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14411167.), filed by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(BLOOM, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RITE AID CORPORATION et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KEELEY
Represented By: RACHEL ADCOX
Represented By: EDWARD M. MATHIAS
Represented By: CRAIG M. REISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: ERIC L. BLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.
Represented By: ERIC L. BLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?