FUSION ELITE ALL STARS et al v. VARSITY BRANDS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FUSION ELITE ALL STARS, SPIRIT FACTOR LLC agent of d/b/a FUEL ATHLETICS and SPIRIT FACTOR LLC D/B/A FUEL ATHLETICS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant: U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC., VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY BRANDS, LLC and VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03390
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED CONSISTENT WITH THE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (ECF NO. 8) AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO CLOSE THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/12/20. 8/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by FUSION ELITE ALL STARS, SPIRIT FACTOR LLC. (CRAMER, ERIC)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Transfer CASES TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE filed by VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Declaration of John Newby, #5 Declaration of Steven Kaiser, #6 Declaration of Steve Peterson)(POZOS, ANTONIO)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS on behalf of VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC with Certificate of Service(POZOS, ANTONIO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FUSION ELITE ALL STARS, SPIRIT FACTOR LLC. VARSITY BRANDS, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (CRAMER, ERIC)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FUSION ELITE ALL STARS, SPIRIT FACTOR LLC. U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC. waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (CRAMER, ERIC)
July 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC., VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC. E-mailed To: ERIC L. CRAMER, ESQ. on 7/14/2020 (dmc, )
July 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FUSION ELITE ALL STARS, SPIRIT FACTOR LLC. (JL )
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SPIRIT FACTOR LLC.(CRAMER, ERIC)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FUSION ELITE ALL STARS.(CRAMER, ERIC)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC., VARSITY BRANDS, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC, VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14414354.), filed by FUSION ELITE ALL STARS, SPIRIT FACTOR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(CRAMER, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FUSION ELITE ALL STARS et al v. VARSITY BRANDS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUSION ELITE ALL STARS
Represented By: ERIC L. CRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPIRIT FACTOR LLC agent of d/b/a FUEL ATHLETICS
Represented By: ERIC L. CRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPIRIT FACTOR LLC D/B/A FUEL ATHLETICS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: ERIC L. CRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ALL STAR FEDERATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARSITY SPIRIT FASHION & SUPPLIES, LLC
Represented By: ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARSITY BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARSITY SPIRIT, LLC
Represented By: ANTONIO MIGUEL POZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?