MCCOLLUM v. WAHL et al
Plaintiff: PORTIA E MCCOLLUM
Defendant: THEODORE WAHL and JOHN C. SHEA
Nominal Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03426
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED AND THIS ACTION IS HEREBY STAYED IN ITS ENTIRETY UNTIL THE SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE CONCLUDES ITS INVESTIGATION AND FILES A STATEMENT OF DETERMINATION AND SUPPORTING REPORT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/30/20. 7/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WHITNEY R. REDDING on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., JOHN C. SHEA, THEODORE WAHL with Certificate of Service(REDDING, WHITNEY)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. BOLAND on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., JOHN C. SHEA, THEODORE WAHL with Certificate of Service(BOLAND, DANIEL)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNA J. CLINE on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., JOHN C. SHEA, THEODORE WAHL with Certificate of Service(CLINE, JOANNA)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT L. HICKOK on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., JOHN C. SHEA, THEODORE WAHL with Certificate of Service(HICKOK, ROBERT)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY A. DUBOW on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., JOHN C. SHEA, THEODORE WAHL with Certificate of Service(DUBOW, JAY)
July 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to JOHN C. SHEA, THEODORE WAHL. E-mailed To: JOSHUA H. GRABAR, ESQ. on 7/14/2020 (dmc, )
July 13, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PORTIA E MCCOLLUM. (fb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14417604.), filed by PORTIA E MCCOLLUM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2020: #4 Exhibit A) (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCOLLUM v. WAHL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORE WAHL
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: JOANNA J. CLINE
Represented By: ROBERT L. HICKOK
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: WHITNEY R. REDDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. SHEA
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: JOANNA J. CLINE
Represented By: ROBERT L. HICKOK
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: WHITNEY R. REDDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: JOANNA J. CLINE
Represented By: ROBERT L. HICKOK
Represented By: DANIEL J. BOLAND
Represented By: WHITNEY R. REDDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTIA E MCCOLLUM
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?