GILLETTE v. KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Plaintiff: CALEB GILLETTE
Defendant: KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv03502
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CALEB GILLETTE re: Gean Smith served Summons and Complaint upon KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION by Personal Service. KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (KARPF, ARI)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of CALEB GILLETTE (OLCESE, ANDREW)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. SEILER on behalf of CALEB GILLETTE (SEILER, TIMOTHY)
July 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION. E-Mailed To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 7/29/20. (va, )
July 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CALEB GILLETTE. (md, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14427262.), filed by CALEB GILLETTE.(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILLETTE v. KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEB GILLETTE
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: TIMOTHY S. SEILER
Represented By: ANDREW OLCESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?