KENNEDY v. MS. MASON et al
Petitioner: CHAL KENNEDY, SR.
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, MS. MASON and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2020cv03512
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Referring Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 PAPER #5 MAILED TO THE PRO SE (JL )
August 18, 2020 COPY OF PETITION #2, ORDER #5 AND DOCKET E-MAILED TO PA. ATTY. GEN. CRIMINAL DIVISION (jpd, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT, BECAUSE KENNEDY HAS ALREADY PAID THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL - CRIMINAL LAW DIVISION WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/18/20. Motions referred to MARILYN HEFFLEY. 8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND E-MAILED WITH COPY OF PETITION #2, ORDER #5 AND DOCKET TO PA. ATTY. GEN. CRIMINAL DIVISION (jpd, )
July 22, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PPE216946 (dmc, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by PRO SE PETITIONER CHAL KENNEDY, SR. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (kw, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by PRO SE PETITIONER CHAL KENNEDY, SR. (IFP PENDING) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track, #2 Designation Form) "ENVELOPE ATTACHED"(kw, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, FILED BY PRO SE PETITIONER CHAL KENNEDY, SR. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED" (kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. MS. MASON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MS. MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHAL KENNEDY, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?