STEWART v. GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RAINA STEWART
Defendant: DEREK GIBBONS, TIM LU, VESPER HOLDINGS, LLC and GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as VESPER DAYCLUB
Case Number: 2:2020cv03514
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAINA STEWART served Summons and Complaint upon VESPER HOLDINGS, LLC. VESPER HOLDINGS, LLC served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAINA STEWART served Summons and Complaint upon TIM LU. TIM LU served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAINA STEWART served Summons and Complaint upon GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC. GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAINA STEWART served Summons and Complaint upon DEREK GIBBONS. DEREK GIBBONS served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. BURKE on behalf of RAINA STEWART (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/21/2020. 7/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
July 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to DEREK GIBBONS, GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC, TIM LU, VESPER HOLDINGS, LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/17/20 (jaa, )
July 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RAINA STEWART. (lisad, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEREK GIBBONS, GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC, TIM LU, VESPER HOLDINGS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429448.), filed by RAINA STEWART.(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART v. GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAINA STEWART
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: CHRISTINE E. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM LU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VESPER HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLU HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as VESPER DAYCLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?