GOODMAN v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD GOODMAN
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT and LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03515
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER ON 9/23/2020 AT 11:00 A.M., ETC.SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/9/20. 9/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (sg, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.(STEVENS, CAPRI) Modified on 7/31/2020 (tjd).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lowes Companies, Inc by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.(COHEN, DAVID)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT, LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC , PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 200600384, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429560), filed by LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT, LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(COHEN, DAVID) Modified on 7/20/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOODMAN v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT
Represented By: DAVID S. COHEN
Represented By: CAPRI R. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID S. COHEN
Represented By: CAPRI R. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD GOODMAN
Represented By: SEAN M. FULMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?