SULIKOWSKI v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ARTHUR SULIKOWSKI
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 2:2020cv03620
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by ARTHUR SULIKOWSKI.. (IMBESI, STEPHANIE)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form)(fdc, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental Procedural Order 7/29/20 Entered and copies e-mailed. (fdc)
July 29, 2020 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (fdc, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 7/28/20.7/29/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ARTHUR SULIKOWSKI..(IMBESI, STEPHANIE)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by ARTHUR SULIKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #2 Case Management Track Form Tracking form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form Designation form, #5 Exhibit Form 5 1 3)(IMBESI, STEPHANIE) (IFP GRANTED) Modified 7/29/20 (fdc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULIKOWSKI v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR SULIKOWSKI
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. IMBESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?