MCINTYRE v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY et al
Plaintiff: GERARD MCINTYRE
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION and SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Case Number: 2:2020cv03995
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/5/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/5/2021. (tjd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT INITIAL DISCLOSURES ARE DUE BY 10/15/20. ANY MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS AND ANY MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO JOIN OTHER PARTIES SHALL BE FILED BY 10/19/20. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 1/5/21. EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 2/5/21. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 4/5/21. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/5/21. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 4/20/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/5/20. 10/5/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. A Telephone Pretrial Conference was held on 10/5/20. (fdc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SEPTA'S ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, AMTRAK'S CROSSCLAIMS by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(MCKENZIE, THOMAS)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 26 Disclosures with Certificate of Service by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(MCKENZIE, THOMAS) Modified on 9/30/2020 (tjd).
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: A telephone pretrial conference will be held on October 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Call-in instructions are outlined herein. (nds)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SHIPMAN, PAOLO)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR AMTRAK TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS EXTENDED TO 9/21/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/3/20. 9/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (BRUNETTI, YURI)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S PROCEDURE FOR ASSIGNMENT OF A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO CERTAIN DISTRICT COURT JUDGES ON A ROTATING BASIS, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/18/20. 8/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION.(SHIPMAN, PAOLO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14498877), from the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County Case No. 191201150, filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(md, ) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #7 Designation Form, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (md, ). Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCINTYRE v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: PAOLO R. SHIPMAN
Represented By: YURI J. BRUNETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: THOMAS J. MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARD MCINTYRE
Represented By: JONATHAN D. MARX
Represented By: THEODOR KAPLUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?