GRIFFIN v. CITY OF COATESVILLE et al
Plaintiff: JOHN GRIFFIN
Defendant: CITY OF COATESVILLE, COATESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL T. KINSMAN and POLICE OFFICER SNYDER
Case Number: 2:2020cv03998
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CITY OF COATESVILLE, COATESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, MICHAEL T. KINSMAN, SNYDER.Brief and Certificate of Service.(SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN GRIFFIN. SNYDER waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (AYRES, SUSAN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN GRIFFIN. MICHAEL T. KINSMAN waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (AYRES, SUSAN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN GRIFFIN. COATESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (AYRES, SUSAN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN GRIFFIN. CITY OF COATESVILLE waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (AYRES, SUSAN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR on behalf of CITY OF COATESVILLE, COATESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, MICHAEL T. KINSMAN, SNYDER with Certificate of Service(SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
August 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to CITY OF COATESVILLE, COATESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, MICHAEL T. KINSMAN, SNYDER. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/19/2020 (bw, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14499038.), filed by JOHN GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(AYRES, SUSAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. CITY OF COATESVILLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF COATESVILLE
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COATESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL T. KINSMAN
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER SNYDER
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GRIFFIN
Represented By: SUSAN B. AYRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?