CROMPTON v. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DIANE CANNON CROMPTON
Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, COIT SERVICES, INC. and SPECIALIZED CLEANING AND RESTORATION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04002
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LORENZ, MICHAEL)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DIANE CANNON CROMPTON. (CASPER, MICHAEL)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DIANE CANNON CROMPTON. (CASPER, MICHAEL)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
September 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to SPECIALIZED CLEANING AND RESTORATION, LLC. E-Mailed To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 9/22/20. (va, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum & Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LORENZ, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 9/14/20.9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SPECIALIZED CLEANING AND RESTORATION, LLC, filed by DIANE CANNON CROMPTON.(DIULIO, ANTHONY) Modified on 9/16/2020 (md, ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum & Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LORENZ, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DIANE CANNON CROMPTON. (CASPER, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. LORENZ on behalf of ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (LORENZ, MICHAEL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal with State Court by MICHAEL P. MAGUIRE on behalf of ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY(MAGUIRE, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (md, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), (MAGUIRE, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(MAGUIRE, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14499570), from the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County Case No. 200701135 filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Removal to Adversary, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #6 Designation Form Designation Form)(MAGUIRE, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/17/2020 (md, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/17/2020) (md, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/17/2020) (md, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/17/2020) (md, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/17/2020) (md, ). Modified on 8/17/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROMPTON v. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE CANNON CROMPTON
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO
Represented By: MICHAEL J. CASPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL P. MAGUIRE
Represented By: MICHAEL K. LORENZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COIT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED CLEANING AND RESTORATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?