KROLIKOWSKI v. LELAND et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS KROLIKOWSKI
Defendant: BRIAN FETTEROLF and STUART E LELAND
Case Number: 2:2020cv04008
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Stuart E. Leland by BRIAN FETTEROLF.(ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against STUART E LELAND by BRIAN FETTEROLF.(ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) 10/7/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/7/2020) (sfl, ). Modified on 10/7/2020 (sfl, ).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: MR. FETTEROLF SHALL FILE ANY RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY OCTOBER 13, 2020. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/30/2020. 9/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. ZIMMERMAN on behalf of BRIAN FETTEROLF (ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against BRIAN FETTEROLF by STUART E LELAND.(DODD-O, JAMES)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Complaint upon Stuart E. Leland by Certified Mail on 09/02/2020 (SHAFFER, MICHAEL)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Complaint upon Brian Fetterolf by Certified Mail on 09/02/2020 (SHAFFER, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to BRIAN FETTEROLF, STUART E LELAND. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/20/2020 (bw, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS KROLIKOWSKI. (SHAFFER, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee for COMPLAINT or NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS KROLIKOWSKI. (Filing Fee $400, receipt number 0313-14508202). (SHAFFER, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN FETTEROLF, STUART E LELAND, filed by THOMAS KROLIKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(md, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KROLIKOWSKI v. LELAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN FETTEROLF
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIMMERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART E LELAND
Represented By: JAMES J. DODD-O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS KROLIKOWSKI
Represented By: MICHAEL D. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?