DRAUGHON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: STACIE L DRAUGHON
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 2:2020cv04015
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by STACIE L DRAUGHON.. (FRIEDMAN, F.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent)(jaa, )
August 19, 2020 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (kw, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental Standing Procedural Order. 8/20/20 Entered and Copies e-mailed. (kw, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P. 4(i) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM, ETC.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 8/19/20.8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by STACIE L DRAUGHON.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FRIEDMAN, F.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by STACIE L DRAUGHON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(FRIEDMAN, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRAUGHON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACIE L DRAUGHON
Represented By: F. MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?