MURRAY et al v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: IRVIN MURRAY, EDWIN JONES, MAURICE SCOTT, DOLORES MCFADDEN and FAITH ANNE BURDICK
Defendant: MAYOR JAMES KENNEY and THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Amicus Curiae: Philadelphia Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv04018
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT A CONFERENCE TO DISCUSS PLAINTIFFS' PRACEIPE TO WITHDRAW COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOC. NO. #33 ) WILL BE HELD ON 10/19/20, AT 1:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/7/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION to Withdraw Complaint without Prejudice filed by FAITH ANNE BURDICK, EDWIN JONES, DOLORES MCFADDEN, IRVIN MURRAY.Certificate of Service.(HUFF, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #29 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S ARE GRANTED LEAVE UNTIL 9/25/20 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 9/28/20 IS CONTINUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/21/20.9/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER 12(b)(6) filed by FAITH ANNE BURDICK, EDWIN JONES, DOLORES MCFADDEN, IRVIN MURRAY, Philadelphia Housing Authority, MAURICE SCOTT. (HUFF, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE HEARING TO CONSIDER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (RE: DOC. NO. #29 ) WILL BE HELD ON 9/28/20, AT 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/18/20. 9/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER 12(b)(6) filed by MAYOR JAMES KENNEY, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(BRAY, KRISTIN)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #5 IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. FURTHER, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PROFESSOR SENA'S AUGUST 20, 2020 TESTIMONY IS GRANTED; AND, THE MOTIONS TO PROCEED IFP #2 #3 #4 ARE GRANTED. THE COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER, INCLUDING ENFORCEMENT OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/25/2020. 08/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
August 25, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/25/2020. 08/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 Audio File 08/24/2020 2:02:18 pm, regarding Telephone conference held on 08/24/2020, before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO (ked, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Motion Hearing held on 8/24/20 re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by FAITH ANNE BURDICK, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by IRVIN MURRAY, MAURICE SCOTT, EDWIN JONES, FAITH ANNE BURDICK, DOLORES MCFADDEN (amas, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE: A telephonic oral argument will be held on August 24, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Call-in instructions are outlined herein. (nds)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW RICHMAN on behalf of MAYOR JAMES KENNEY, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (RICHMAN, ANDREW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTION. (amas, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #15 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY THAT IS ATTACHED TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/20/20.8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Status Conference held on 8/20/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (amas, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENOin Courtroom 15A Motion Hearing held on 8/20/20 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by IRVIN MURRAY, MAURICE SCOTT, EDWIN JONES, FAITH ANNE BURDICK, DOLORES MCFADDEN Court Reporter: ESR. (amas, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 Audio File 08/20/20 01:05:35 pm, regarding temporary restraining order held on 08/20/20, before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO (ked, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING PLAINTIFFS' WITNESSES, JONNELL JOHNSON, IRVIN MURRAY, JENNIFER BENNETCH, AND JEREMY WILLIAMS, SHALL BE PERMITTED TO ENTER THE COURTHOUSE ON 8/20/20, IN ORDER TO TESTIFY AT THE 1:00 PM HEARING, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/20/20. 8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/20/20. 8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Philadelphia Housing Authority.Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KENIS, ANDREW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Plaintiffs filed by MAYOR JAMES KENNEY, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits and Witness List)(BRAY, KRISTIN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE that the hearing on the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction scheduled for August 20, 2020 at 1:00 pm will be held in Courtroom 15A.(rv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA P. CORTES on behalf of MAYOR JAMES KENNEY, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(CORTES, DIANA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN K. BRAY on behalf of MAYOR JAMES KENNEY with Certificate of Service(BRAY, KRISTIN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN K. BRAY on behalf of THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(BRAY, KRISTIN)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL SUBMIT A MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR POSITION BY 9:00 A.M. ON AUGUST 20, 2020, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/18/2020. 08/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Status Conference held on 8/18/20. (amas, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #5 WILL BE HELD ON AUGUST 20, 2020 AT 1:00 P.M. BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/18/2020. 08/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON AUGUST 18, 2020 AT 2:15 P.M. BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS ARE OUTLINED HEREIN. FURTHER, PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEY, MICHAEL N. HUFF, ESQUIRE SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THE DEFENDANTS AND THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPARTMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 08/18/2020. 08/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
August 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to MAYOR JAMES KENNEY, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/18/20 (JL )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 FAITH ANNE BURDICK, EDWIN JONES, DOLORES MCFADDEN, IRVIN MURRAY, MAURICE SCOTT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MEMORANDUM.. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM, #2 PROPOSED ORDER)(JL ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #3 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (jl, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAURICE SCOTT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS..(JL )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 IRVIN MURRAY MOTION TO APPEAR PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 FAITH ANNE BURDICK MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(JL )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAYOR JAMES KENNEY, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, filed by EDWIN JONES, FAITH ANNE BURDICK, IRVIN MURRAY, MAURICE SCOTT, DOLORES MCFADDEN. (IFP PENDING) (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 CASE MANAGEMENT, #3 DESIGNATION FORM)(JL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURRAY et al v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRVIN MURRAY
Represented By: MICHAEL N. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL N. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICE SCOTT
Represented By: MICHAEL N. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOLORES MCFADDEN
Represented By: MICHAEL N. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAITH ANNE BURDICK
Represented By: MICHAEL N. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR JAMES KENNEY
Represented By: KRISTIN K. BRAY
Represented By: ANDREW RICHMAN
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: KRISTIN K. BRAY
Represented By: ANDREW RICHMAN
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Philadelphia Housing Authority
Represented By: ANDREW JAMES KENIS
Represented By: MICHAEL N. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?