BOWEN v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: KIM BOWEN
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04038
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Original record transferred to the District of NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA via interdistrict transfer system. (lvj, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-233) THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1407 TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF 10/3/2016, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE VINCE CHHABRIA. (amas, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Federal Express re: served Complaint upon Monsanto Company by Personal on 8/25/20 (MILLER, ROBERT)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/20/20 (jaa, )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KIM BOWEN. (JL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14504851.), filed by KIMBERLY R. BOWEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(MILLER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOWEN v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM BOWEN
Represented By: ROBERT S. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?