Hochstuhl v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: LISA HOCHSTUHL
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv04043
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES ON _TUESDAY, OCTOBER 27, 2020 AT 2:00PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. COUNSEL SHALL CALL-IN AS FOLLOWS: 571-353-2300 ACCESS CODE: 728 193 472, THEN PRESS #. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/9/20. 10/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED by MICHAEL BONASSO on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION(amas, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JON A. STRONGMAN on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION(STRONGMAN, JON)
September 10, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL ALAN TANENBAUM on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION(TANENBAUM, MICHAEL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by AARON L. DUNBAR on behalf of LISA HOCHSTUHL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DUNBAR, AARON)
August 27, 2020 DOCS # 23, 28 & 29 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 8/27/20 (rf, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON L. DUNBAR on behalf of LISA HOCHSTUHL with Certificate of Service(DUNBAR, AARON)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHRISTINE R.M. KAIN, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #27 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/25/20.8/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EMILY D. STEEB, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #26 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/25/20.8/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Christine R. M. Kain ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14518126.) filed by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Emily D. Steeb ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14516742.) filed by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(ABERNETHY, DAVID) (Main Document 26 replaced on 8/25/2020) (nd, ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ on behalf of LISA HOCHSTUHL with Certificate of Service(GOMEZ, CHRISTOPHER)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/20/20. 8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )*NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-13666. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #9 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #16 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #17 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #18 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #22 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #23 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #24 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt, #27 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #28 Exhibit ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt, #29 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #30 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #31 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #32 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #33 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #34 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #35 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #36 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #42 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher, #43 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher, #44 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev, #45 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #46 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev, #47 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #48 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A1, #49 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A2, #50 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh B, #51 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh D, #52 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh E, #53 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev, #54 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #55 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #56 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #57 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #58 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #59 Exhibit ECF 7011 - BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Dr. B. Rosenzweig, #60 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #61 Exhibit ECF 7175 - BSC's Reply ISO MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #62 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #63 Exhibit ECF 52 - BSC's Memo MTE Guelcher, #64 Exhibit ECF 74 - Ptfs Opp to Dft_s MTE Guelcher, #65 Exhibit ECF 88 - BSC's Reply MTE Guelcher, #66 Exhibit ECF 100 - Memo, Opinion, and Order (Daubert Motions), #67 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #68 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC's Opposition to Pltf's MTE Spiegelberg, #69 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #70 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #71 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 8/18/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition on dates and at times to be determined. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Scott Daucher on November 6, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Lisa Hochstuhl on July 9, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Hochstuhl for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Lisa Hochstuhl. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF JUDGMENT as to #6 COURTESY COPY OF Petition for a Writ of Mandamus by C. Jane Mowry, Kathleen Lambert, Edie Lorant, Lisa Hochstuhl, Catherine Tallyen. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 9 4CCA JUDGMENT re: #6 COURTESY COPY OF Petition for a Writ of Mandamus by C. Jane Mowry, Kathleen Lambert, Edie Lorant, Lisa Hochstuhl, Catherine Tallyen in 4CCA Case No. 16-2333. The Petition for Writ of Mandamus is denied. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 8 DOCKETING NOTICE - ORIGINAL PROCEEDINGS in 4CCA Case No. 16-2333, dated 11/21/2016. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING BY 4CCA re: #6 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus in 4CCA Case No. 16-2333. Case Manager: Jennifer Rice. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 6 COURTESY COPY OF Petition for a Writ of Mandamus by C. Jane Mowry, Kathleen Lambert, Edie Lorant, Lisa Hochstuhl, Catherine Tallyen (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits) (originals filed with the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 28, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 22, 2015 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 10/21/2015. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 10/15/2015, answer due 12/14/2015. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 22, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 6, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 126 (Order Rescheduling Time of Status Conference on June 2, 2015) entered on 05/22/2015 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 5, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4152617. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hochstuhl v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA HOCHSTUHL
Represented By: LEE B. BALEFSKY
Represented By: MICHELLE L. TIGER
Represented By: PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ
Represented By: AARON L. DUNBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL BONASSO
Represented By: JON A. STRONGMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Represented By: JAMES H. KEALE
Represented By: EMILY D. STEEB
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHRISTINE R.M. KAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?