PHY v. TARGET CORPORATION
Plaintiff: STACY PHY
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION doing business as TARGET STORES
Case Number: 2:2020cv04046
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
September 28, 2020 CERTIFIED COPY OF DOC. 11 MAILED TO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS WITH DOCKET SHEET AND RETENT LETTER (sg, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE FULL AMOUNT OF ANY DAMAGES CLAIMED BY PLAINTIFF IN THIS CASE DO NOT EXCEED $75,000. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS LAWSUIT BE REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, CASE NO 200700857, AS THE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY IS LESS THAN THE DIVERSITY JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT AS SET FORTH IN 28 U.S.C. 1332. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/24/20. 9/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 9/25/2020 (tjd).
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Telephone Conference held on 9/23/20 (mbh, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (RANDAZZO, SUSANNA)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by STACY PHY.Memorandum, Cert of Service.(GREENFIELD, MARC)
August 19, 2020 Case Eligible for Arbitration(fb)
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STACY PHY. (fb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TARGET CORPORATION d/b/a Target Stores (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14505942), filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(RANDAZZO, SUSANNA) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/20/2020) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHY v. TARGET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY PHY
Represented By: MARC F. GREENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION doing business as TARGET STORES
Represented By: SUSANNA RANDAZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?