ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED, BROAN-NUTONE LLC and JAKEL INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2020cv04047
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/13/20. 10/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulation to Approve Stipulated Protective Order with Proposed Form of Order by BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (HAFNER, ROBERT) Modified on 10/14/2020 (fb).
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUGHES, PATRICK)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/20/2020 AT 1:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/30/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND E. MACK on behalf of ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MACK, RAYMOND)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nortek, Inc. by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Regal Beloit Corporation by JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Defenses by JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re: Denise Fabela served Summons and Complaint upon BROAN-NUTONE LLC by Personal. BROAN-NUTONE LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (HUGHES, PATRICK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020 (HUGHES, PATRICK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Motors Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020 (HUGHES, PATRICK)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/20/20 (JL)
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (fb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14506335.), filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(HUGHES, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKEL INCORPORATED
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICK A. HUGHES
Represented By: RAYMOND E. MACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?