WARE et al v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TOM WARE and CAROL WARE
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON doing business as ALZA CORPORATION doing business as JANSSEN ORTHO LLC doing business as JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC doing business as ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER U.S. L.L.C., BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION and JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY DEFENDANTS #1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv04053
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(MILLER, CHANDA)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER U.S. L.L.C..(MILLER, CHANDA)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER U.S. L.L.C..(MILLER, CHANDA)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by CHANDA A MILLER on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER U.S. L.L.C. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MILLER, CHANDA)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER U.S. L.L.C. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Matthew J. Honnold re: served Summons and Complaint upon Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by E-Mail on 10/15/2020 (KESSLER, RAYNA)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BAYER CORPORATION; BAYER U.S. L.L.C. THAT THE DEADLINE TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 10/16/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Matthew J. Honnold re: served Summons and Complaint upon Johnson & Johnson by E-Mail on 8/27/2020 (KESSLER, RAYNA)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by STATUS, L.L.C. re: served Summons and Complaint upon Bayer U.S. LLC by Personal Service on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (KESSLER, RAYNA) Modified on 10/9/2020 (tjd).
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by STATUS, L.L.C. re: served Summons and Complaint upon Bayer Corporation by Personal Service on 9/22/2020, answer 10/13/2020. (KESSLER, RAYNA) Modified on 10/9/2020 (tjd).
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by STATUS, L.L.C. re: served Summons and Complaint upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Personal Service on 8/31/2020 (KESSLER, RAYNA)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ian S. Millican, Esq. by CAROL WARE, TOM WARE.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Sponsor's Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KESSLER, RAYNA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE - SET FOR THURSDAY OCTOBER 29, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE - COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO SHALL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov.(amw, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #6 MOTION TO STAY BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 09/29/2020.09/29/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING A DECISION ON MDL CENTRALIZATION filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service and Exhibit A.(MILLER, CHANDA)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(MILLER, CHANDA)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TO EXTEND TIME FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/23/20. 9/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIE E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (jaa, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHANDA A MILLER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MILLER, CHANDA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER U.S. L.L.C., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/20/2020 (bw, )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CAROL WARE, TOM WARE. (fb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER U.S. L.L.C., JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY #1-10, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14507395.), filed by CAROL WARE, TOM WARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(KESSLER, RAYNA) Modified on 8/20/2020 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARE et al v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON doing business as ALZA CORPORATION doing business as JANSSEN ORTHO LLC doing business as JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC doing business as ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER U.S. L.L.C.
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY DEFENDANTS #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM WARE
Represented By: RAYNA E. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL WARE
Represented By: RAYNA E. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?