HOWARD BICHEFSKY, DMD v. HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: HOWARD BICHEFSKY, DMD and HOWELL BICHEFSKY
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP D/B/A THE HARTFORD and HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. doing business as THE HARTFORD
Case Number: 2:2020cv04054
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/6/20. 10/6/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST HARTFORD FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. ONLY ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/21/20. 9/21/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (GABLE, RICHARD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN D. HURD on behalf of HOWELL BICHEFSKY (HURD, RYAN)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOWELL BICHEFSKY. HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (HURD, RYAN)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/20/2020 (bw, )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HOWELL BICHEFSKY. (lisad, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14507268.), filed by HOWELL BICHEFSKY, DMD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(SPIZER, GREGORY) Modified on 8/20/2020 (lisad, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2020) (lisad, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/20/2020) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARD BICHEFSKY, DMD v. HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD BICHEFSKY, DMD
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWELL BICHEFSKY
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: RYAN D. HURD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD D. GABLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP D/B/A THE HARTFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. doing business as THE HARTFORD
Represented By: RICHARD D. GABLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?