JOHNAKIN v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: MELVIN JOHNAKIN
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP, LOUIS DeJOY and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2020cv04055
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL DEADLINES IN THIS ACTION ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT OR THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/16/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) 10/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO STAY CASE IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by MELVIN JOHNAKIN.**(COPY FORWARDED TO THE JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(VANDERVEEN, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/9/2020 (tjd).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS EXTENDED TO 10/9/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/2/20. 10/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by LOUIS DeJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond**(COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (ROBINSON, JOHN) Modified on 10/2/2020 (tjd).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE COURT HEREBY ENTERS THIS PROTECTIVE ORDER TO PROTECT CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION THAT MAY BE PRODUCED AS PART OF THE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RESPONSE, OR AS OTHERWISE REQUIRED IN THE COURSE OF THE PROCEEDINGS IN THIS ACTION AND TO SET FORTH MANDATORY PROCEDURES FOR PERSONS WHO RECEIVE OR REVIEW DOCUMENTS OR INFORMATION PRODUCED SUBJECT TO THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/25/20. 9/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (FRE 502(d) Order) filed by LOUIS DeJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE..(BORSON, JOSEPH)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS DIRECTLY REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH, AS RELATED TO COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, ET AL VS. LOUIS DEJOY, ET AL, CIVIL ACTION NO. 20-4096. SIGNED BY KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/24/20. 9/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing(jwl, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH E. BORSON on behalf of LOUIS DeJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (BORSON, JOSEPH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service (VANDERVEEN, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN UNDER RI]LE 26(fl by MELVIN JOHNAKIN.(VANDERVEEN, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/22/2020 (tjd).
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN ROBINSON on behalf of LOUIS DeJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (ROBINSON, JOHN)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: THE RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 9/24/2020 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Brody dated September 18, 2020 to Continue Rule 16 Conference Scheduled on September 22, 2020 filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE.(GILL, ERIC) Modified on 9/21/2020 (tjd).
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MELVIN JOHNAKIN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VANDERVEEN, MICHAEL)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC D. GILL on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE with Certificate of Service(GILL, ERIC)
September 3, 2020 RULE 16 CONFERENCE is SET FOR 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. (jwl, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/22/2020 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/3/2020) (jwl, ). Modified on 9/3/2020 (jwl, ).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KUNTAL V. CHOLERA on behalf of LOUIS DeJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (CHOLERA, KUNTAL)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to LOUIS DeJOY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. Forwarded To: Michael T. Vanderveen on 8/24/20 (fdc, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14507322.), filed by MELVIN JOHNAKIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form)(VANDERVEEN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNAKIN v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: KUNTAL V. CHOLERA
Represented By: JOSEPH E. BORSON
Represented By: JOHN ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DeJOY
Represented By: KUNTAL V. CHOLERA
Represented By: JOSEPH E. BORSON
Represented By: JOHN ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: KUNTAL V. CHOLERA
Represented By: JOSEPH E. BORSON
Represented By: JOHN ROBINSON
Represented By: ERIC D. GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN JOHNAKIN
Represented By: MICHAEL T. VANDERVEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?