GERHOLT v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: JOHN GERHOLT
Defendant: WELLPATH, JOHN WETZEL, STEPHEN ST. VINCENT, K SUBEN, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, C STEFFENIO, MS G ORLANDO and DAVID A THOMAS, JR
Case Number: 2:2020cv04079
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRIES #4 AND 5 WITH FORMS TO PLAINTIFF ON 9/1/20. (jaa, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/1/2020) (bw, ).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF 8/31/20 THT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. JOHN GERHOLT SHALL PAY THE FILING FEE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THECLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF SCI-PHOENIX. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED IN PARTY WITH PREJUDICE AND IN PARTY WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ETC. GERHOLD MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERIVCE UNTIL SO ORDERED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT WITH THE ABOVE ACTION NUMBER. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 8/31/20. 8/31/20 ENTERED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) Modified on 8/31/2020 (dt, ). Modified on 9/1/2020 (dt, ).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION OF8/31/20. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 8/31/20. 8/31/20 ENTERED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF) Modified on 8/31/2020 (dt, ). Modified on 9/1/2020 (lisad, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOHN GERHOLT. (rf, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against G ORLANDO, STEPHEN ST. VINCENT, C STEFFENIO, K SUBEN, DAVID A THOMAS, JR, WELLPATH, JOHN WETZEL, filed by JOHN GERHOLT., EXHIBITS, ENVELOPE ATTACHED. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(rf, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 (rf, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by JOHN GERHOLT..(rf, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 (rf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GERHOLT v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN ST. VINCENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K SUBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C STEFFENIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS G ORLANDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A THOMAS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GERHOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?