Zimmermann v. Doylestown Borough et al
Plaintiff: E. EDWARD ZIMMERMANN doing business as THE FIRM
Defendant: DOYLESTOWN BOROUGH and THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2020cv04090
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE218843 (JL)
September 2, 2020 PAPER #7 ALONG WITH PRO SE APPLICATION MAILED TO THE PRO SE (JL )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT IF ZIMMERMAN SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $400 (THE $$350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE ZIMMERMAN WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. ZIMMERMAN MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE. IF ZIMMERMAN FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/1/20. 9/1/20 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER & NON-PRISONER IFP APPLICATION WERE NOT MAILED TO ZIMMERMAN.(fdc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-01407. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 8/17/2020. (cw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/21/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/21/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint, #2 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules, #3 AO 398 and 399 Forms, #4 AO 398 and 399 Forms) (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/21/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement by E. Edward Zimmermann to #1 Complaint. (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/21/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doylestown Borough, The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, filed by E. Edward Zimmermann.(ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmermann v. Doylestown Borough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOYLESTOWN BOROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. EDWARD ZIMMERMANN doing business as THE FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?