TILLMAN v. MARLER et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. TILLMAN
Defendant: SEAN MARLER, RAEPH LAUGHINGWELL, ELIZABETH SHERNECKE and KEVIN CASSANO
Case Number: 2:2020cv04101
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 COPY OF ORDER #8 MAILED TO PRO SE (jpd, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/23/20 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/16/20. 9/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO TILLMAN.(rf, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MICHAEL D. TILLMAN MOTION REQUEST FROM THE COURTS AN EXTENSION OF 30-60 DAYS WHATEVER IS BEST FOR THE COURTS FOR MORE TIME TO AMEND MY COMPLAINT..(JL )
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
August 31, 2020 DOCS 4 AND 5 AND BLANK COMPLAINT PACKAGE MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. MICHAEL D. TILLMAN SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF FDC-PHILADELPHIA. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED IN PART WITH PREJUDICE AND IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. TILLMAN MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND TILLMAN A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE WARDEN SEAN MARLER, MEDICAL DIRECTOR KEVIN CASSANO AND MEDICAL RECORDS EMPLOYEE ELIZABETH SHERNECKE AS DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/28/20. 8/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO TILLMAN. *EMAILED TO WARDEN OF FDC-PHILADELPHIA* *COMPLAINT PACKAGE NOT SENT TO TILLMAN*(rf, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/28/20. 8/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO TILLMAN.(rf, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against KEVIN CASSANO, RAEPH LAUGHINGWELL, SEAN MARLER, ELIZABETH SHERNECKE, filed by MICHAEL D. TILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(amas, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/21/2020) (amas, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MICHAEL D. TILLMAN. (amas, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHAEL D. TILLMAN.(amas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TILLMAN v. MARLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN MARLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAEPH LAUGHINGWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH SHERNECKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN CASSANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. TILLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?