LAWSON v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: TYREE LAWSON
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, POLICE OFFICER MOSTILLER Badge No. 5935, DETECTIVE KUCHINSKY Badge No. 904 and POLICE OFFICER SLOBODIAN Badge No. 5573
Case Number: 2:2020cv04568
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ACCOMPANIED AMENDED COMPLAINT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (mbh, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL filed by TYREE LAWSON.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jaa, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by TYREE LAWSON.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jaa, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(DAVIS, KATIE)
September 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (JL )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14574225), filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form, #7 Certificate of Service)(DAVIS, KATIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAWSON v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: KATIE COOPER DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER MOSTILLER Badge No. 5935
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE KUCHINSKY Badge No. 904
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER SLOBODIAN Badge No. 5573
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYREE LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?