HUMANA INC. v. INDIVIOR INC. et al
Plaintiff: HUMANA INC.
Defendant: AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC., INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC., INDIVIOR PLC, MONOSOL RX, LLC, RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC and RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS SOLUTIONS INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04602
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON on behalf of INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC. with Certificate of Service(LIPSCOMB-JACKSON, TIFFANY)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC..(BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INDIVIOR INC..(BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN BERMAN on behalf of INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC. with Certificate of Service(BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCS. 11 TO 15 MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL. ECF APP MAILED TO ATTORNEY. (sg, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KEITH J. HARRISON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/2/20. 10/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED COUNSEL AND UNREPS.(JL )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KENT A. GARDINER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/2/20. 10/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED COUNSEL AND UNREPS.(JL )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL A. SASSE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/2/20. 10/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED COUNSEL AND UNREPS.(JL )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF TIFFANIE L. MCDOWELL TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/2/20. 10/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED COUNSEL AND UNREPS.(JL )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SIMA NAMIRI-KALANTARI TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/2/20. 10/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED COUNSEL AND UNREPS.(JL )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HUMANA INC. of Application for Pro Hac Vice of Kent A. Gardiner; Application for Pro Hac Vice of Keith J. Harrison; Application for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel A. Sasse; Application for Pro Hac Vice of Tiffanie L. McDowell; and Application for Pro Hac Vice of Sima Namiri-Kalantari (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sima Namiri-Kalantari by HUMANA INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14598175.). (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tiffanie L. McDowell by HUMANA INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14598166.). (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel A. Sasse by HUMANA INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14598161.). (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith J. Harrison by HUMANA INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14598158.). (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kent A. Gardiner by HUMANA INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14598156.). (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HUMANA INC. re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Summons Issued Notice Of A Lawsuit And Request To Waive Service Of A Summons And Waiver Of The Service Of Summons Along With A Copy Of The Complaint (DESANTO, JEROME)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC., INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR PLC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC., RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC, RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/22/2020 (bw, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HUMANA INC.. (md, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HUMANA INC..(DESANTO, JEROME)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC., INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR PLC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC., RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC, RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14577233.), filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(DESANTO, JEROME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUMANA INC. v. INDIVIOR INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONOSOL RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANA INC.
Represented By: JEROME P. DESANTO
Represented By: TIFFANIE L. MCDOWELL
Represented By: DANIEL A. SASSE
Represented By: SIMA NAMIRI-KALANTARI
Represented By: KENT A. GARDINER
Represented By: KEITH J. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?