GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION et al v. ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Lead Plaintiff: GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv04646
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ASPEN SHALL FILE ANY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 11/13/20. RANLUD SHALL FILE ANY REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 12/7/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/13/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Insurable Interest With Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC. (LEVIN, JAY)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JANUARY 6, 2020 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by C. LAWRENCE HOLMES on behalf of GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC with Certificate of Service(HOLMES, C.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Insurable Interest filed by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Statement of Undisputed Facts and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(LEVIN, JAY)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE AMENDED APPLICATION OF JENNIFER D. KATZ, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVI PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/9/20.11/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Pro Hac Vice Application of Jennifer D. Katz filed by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC.Certificate of Service.(LEVIN, JAY)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: A TRIAL SHALL BE HELD ON 4/6/21 IN COURTROOM 14A. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 3/31/21 AT 10:00 AM. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 1/6/21. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRAGE JUDGE TIMOTH R. RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ANY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OR OTHER DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 1/20/21. ALL PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 3/19/21. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 3/19/21.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/6/20. 11/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VIC OF JENNIFER D. KATZ, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/6/20. 11/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 5, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14693105). (LEVIN, JAY)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer D. Katz by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC.. (LEVIN, JAY)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 ASPEN SPECIALITY ANSWER to Complaint by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(URGO, STEVEN)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 11/4/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney) to Extend time to File Responsive Pleading by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (URGO, STEVEN)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC.(LEVIN, JAY)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attorney) (LEVIN, JAY)
September 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. E-mailed to counsel on 9/24/20 (mbh, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/23/2020. 9/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
September 22, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC. (JL)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14582672.), filed by GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(LEVIN, JAY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION et al v. ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: GREENTREE PROPERTIES CORPORATION
Represented By: JAY M. LEVIN
Represented By: JENNIFER D. KATZ
Represented By: C. LAWRENCE HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANLUD ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: JAY M. LEVIN
Represented By: JENNIFER D. KATZ
Represented By: C. LAWRENCE HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN D. URGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?