Milbank Insurance Company v. WILSON
Plaintiff: Milbank Insurance Company
Defendant: WANDA WILSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv04774
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Milbank Insurance Company. WANDA WILSON waiver sent on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (GROSSMAN, DANIEL)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. GROSSMAN on behalf of Milbank Insurance Company (GROSSMAN, DANIEL)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/30/20. 9/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 29, 2020 Summons Issued as to WANDA WILSON. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 9/29/2020 (sg, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including State Auto Financial Corporation by Milbank Insurance Company.(KREKSTEIN, WILLIAM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Declaratory Judgment) against WANDA WILSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14599753.), filed by Milbank Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(KREKSTEIN, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milbank Insurance Company v. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: WILLIAM O. KREKSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL J. GROSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?