BULLARD v. F.O.P. COMMISSIONER et al
Plaintiff: JAMES FOY BULLARD
Defendant: DET. DAVID GANNONE, OFFICER MIKAL CARR, OFFICER TONY WATER, OFFICER ROBERT J. CAMPBELL, F.O.P. COMMISSIONER, DET. TYRONE J. DAVIS, DET. WILLIAM T. CAMPBELL, DET. JANEL CRAIG, DET. JOHN T. MERRIGAN, OFFICER JEREMY E. DUFF, DET. JONATHAN C. EVES and DET. AMIR IORIS
Case Number: 2:2020cv04793
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 Letter dated 11/16/2020 by JAMES FOY BULLARD (sg, )
November 9, 2020 DOC. 12 MAILED TO PRO SE WITH COMPLAINT FORM. (sg, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915.JAMES FOY BULLARD, #685953, SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF PHILADELPHIA INDUSTRIAL CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. #11 IS STRICKEN AS NON-RESPONSIVE TO THECOURT'S OCTOBER 15, 2020 ORDER. MR. BULLARD WILL BE GIVEN AN OPPORTUNITY TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ANY SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MUST IDENTIFY ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE CAPTION OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ADDITION TO IDENTIFYING THEM IN THE BODY OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND MR. BULLARD A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. MR. BULLARD IS ENCOURAGED TO USE THE COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT TO FILE HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. MR. BULLARD SHOULD COMPLETE THE COURT'S STANDARD FORM AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE, SIGN IT, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR FILING. IF MR. BULLARD FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/9/20.11/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jpd, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS **(STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 11/9/2020)**(JL ) Modified on 11/12/2020 (tjd).
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JAMES FOY BULLARD. (JL)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Letter dated 10/23/2020 by JAMES FOY BULLARD (sg, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by JAMES FOY BULLARD. (fdc)
October 19, 2020 IFP Form mailed to pro se plff. (kw, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JAMES FOY BULLARD. (amas, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JAMES FOY BULLARD.(amas, )
October 15, 2020 Remark ORDER #5 TOGETHER WITH A BLANK COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS WERE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF BY CHAMBERS ON 10/15/2020. (sfl, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT IF MR. BULLARD SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT ( OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM MARCH 28, 2020 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 28, 2020, REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD; LF MR. BULLARD IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), EVEN IF HIS CASE IS DISMISSED. HE WILL NOT BE ENTITLED TO THE RETURN OF ANY PAYMENTS MADE TOWARD THE FEE THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MR. BULLARD WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER MR. BULLARD MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/15/20. 10/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Letter dated 10/9/20 RE: STATUS UPDATE (Attachments: #1 DOCKET)(JL )
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Letter dated 10/3/20 by JAMES FOY BULLARD (JL )
October 1, 2020 DOC # 2 (PRO SE GUIDELINES) MAILED TO BULLARD ON 10/1/20 (rf, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT J. CAMPBELL, WILLIAM T. CAMPBELL, MIKAL CARR, JANEL CRAIG, TYRONE J. DAVIS, JEREMY E. DUFF, JONATHAN C. EVES, F.O.P. COMMISSIONER, DAVID GANNONE, AMIR IORIS, JOHN T. MERRIGAN, TONY WATER, filed by JAMES FOY BULLARD. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BULLARD v. F.O.P. COMMISSIONER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. DAVID GANNONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER MIKAL CARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER TONY WATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.O.P. COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. TYRONE J. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. WILLIAM T. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. JANEL CRAIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. JOHN T. MERRIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JEREMY E. DUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. JONATHAN C. EVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. AMIR IORIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES FOY BULLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?