YOUNG v. SHAPIRO
Plaintiff: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PH.D.
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Case Number: 2:2020cv04900
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #14 Notice of Appeal filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PH.D. USCA Case Number 20-3146 (mbh, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 USCA Filing Fee Letter E-Mailed to Young. (fdc)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD. FILING FEE: NOT PAID. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (fdc)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT YOUNG'S MOTION TO NARROW ISSUES AHEAD OF APPEAL #11 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/19/20.10/19/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/21/2020) (fdc, ).
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD. (fdc) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/21/2020) (fdc, ).
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO NARROW ISSUES AHEAD OF AN APPEAL FILED BY HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD.(fdc)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT YOUNG'S #9 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. YOUNG SHALL COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S PREVIOUS ORDER #6 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/12/20.10/13/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO RECONSIDER PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP AHEAD OF APPEAL FILED BY HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(fdc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD. (IFP PENDING)(fdc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD.(fdc)
October 8, 2020 Copy of Order #6 Emailed to PA Attorney General. (fdc) Modified 10/8/20 (fdc).
October 8, 2020 Copies of the IFP Application #1 and Complaint #2 were sent to Young per Judge Marston's 10/8/20 Order #6 . (fdc) Modified 10/8/20 (fdc).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THE UNSIGNED COMPLAINT #2 AND APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 TO YOUNG. IF YOUNG SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE SHALL SIGN THE COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT BY NOVEMBER 8, 2020. YOUNG'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF A HANDWRITTEN SIGNATURE AND FOR LACK OF SUFFICIENT FINANCIAL INFORMATION TO ALLOW THE COURT TO DETERMINE WHETHER SHE HAS THE MEANS TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL. IF YOUNG FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/8/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for SPEEDY Hearing filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD..(bw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR ELECTRONIC ACCESS filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD..(bw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 US MARSHALS FORM, #5 SUMMONS FORM)(bw, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PHD..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG, PH.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?